As the name suggests, the techniques of Vedic maths have their origins in the ancient Vedas which are said to be over 5,000 years old. Its revival was initiated by the Indian mathematician, Jagadguru Swami Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji Maharaja with his book “Vedic Mathematics” which came out in 1965. The chief features of Vedic maths are its accuracy, simplicity and speed, which allow complex problems to be solved easily and efficiently.

Vedic maths uses unique tricks to solve mathematical problems and is popular among both students and teachers. In this blog, we will look into some of the intricacies and methods of Vedic maths tricks for fast calculation which can be very helpful in cracking JEE, CBSE/ICSE Board exams and other competitive exams as they save on calculation time by 10 times.

Also read: Understanding Vedic Maths & its Usage for Beginners

Let’s go through some of the Vedic maths tricks for fast calculation of Maths problems that will hold us in good stead during exams.

**Squaring of a Number Whose Unit Digit Is 5****Dividing A Large Number By 5****Multiplying a Number By 5****Subtraction From 1000, 10000, 100000****Multiplication of Any 2 Digit Numbers from 11 to 19****Multiplication of Any 2 Digit Number by 11****Conversion of Kilograms to Pounds****Find The Square Value**

One of the most useful Vedic maths tricks is to calculate the square of a number where the unit digit is 5. The square of a 2 digit number that ends with 5 can be calculated in no time. For example, to calculate (65)² =?

**Step 1.** Multiply 65 x 65 = . . 25 (end terms)

**Step 2.** Take 6x (6+1) = 42

So the answer is 4225.

This is one of the simplest and most effective Vedic maths tricks for a quick solution that takes a few seconds.

To find the answer for 26952/5:

**Step 1:** 26952 x 2 = 53904

**Step 2: **Move the decimal: 5390.4 or just 5390

There’s a simple Vedic maths trick to multiply any number by 5 that reduces the calculation time.

To multiply an even number by 5, you have to divide the number by 2 and then add a 0 to the end of the result.

For example, 5234 x 5 = ?

**Step 1: **5234/2 = 2617

**Step 2: **Add a 0 to the result. 2617 + 0 = 2617.

To multiply an odd number by 5, subtract 1 from the number, divide it by 2 and add a 5 to the end of the answer.

For example, 2175 x 5 = ?

**Step 1: **2175 – 1 = 2174

**Step 2: **Divide it by 2, 2174/2 = 1087

**Step 3: **Add a 5 to the result, = 10875

To subtract a number from any of the multiples of 100, Vedic maths offers a quick solution. For example, to subtract 683 from 1000, one should subtract each digit in 683 from 9 and finally subtract the last unit digit from 10.

**Step 1:** 9 – 6 = 3

**Step 2:** 9 – 8 = 1

**Step 3:** 10 – 3 = 7

Thus, the answer of 1000 – 683 = 317.

This trick of Vedic maths, with a little practice, enables you to calculate faster than a calculator.

The unit digit of the smaller number should be added to the larger number. Then, multiply the result by 10. Multiply the unit digits of the numbers. Finally, add the two numbers.

For example, when multiplying 17 and 19,

**Step 1:** 19 + 7 = 26.

**Step 2: **26 x 10 = 260.

**Step 3:** 7 x 9 = 63.

**Step 4:** Add 260 + 63 = 323

So, 17 x 19 = 323

One of the Vedic maths tricks is to finish a multiplication problem in only 2 seconds. You can multiply any 2 digit number by 11 in a matter of seconds.

**For example, **42 x 11

42 x 11 = 4 (4+2) 2 = 462

So, the answer is 32 x 11 = 462

There’s a very simple method in Vedic Maths to convert kilograms to pounds. For example, if you want to convert 206 kilograms into pounds,

**Step 1:** Double the kilogram value 206 x 2 = 412

**Step 2.** Divide the number by 10

(412/10 = 41.2).

**Step 3.** Add the two numbers together: 412 + 41.2 = 453.2 pounds

Finding the square of a number using Vedic maths is easy. Just follow the given steps:

(99) ² =?

**Step 1: **Choose a base closer to the original number such as 100.

**Step 2:** Find the difference of the number and the base, 99-100 = -1

**Step 3:** Add the difference with the original number, 99 + (-1) = 98

**Step 4:** Multiply the result with the base, 98 x 100 = 9800

**Step 5: **Now, add the result to the square of the difference, 9800 + (-1)² = 9801

(99) ² = 9801

Also read: What is Vedic maths for Kids?

A lot of problems in any competitive exam paper can be solved in a matter of seconds using Vedic maths. It increases speed and accuracy so you don’t waste time on long, complicated calculations. Some may find it a bit complex but practice makes the process very fast and simple, and it is sure to get you success in exams. It also enhances memory, concentration and problem-solving skills. People using Vedic maths methods show an increase in mental agility, flexibility and mathematical skills. For more information on the tricks of Vedic maths along with other techniques involving numbers,
you can log into the **EuroSchool** website.